Meredith v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Angela M Meredith
Case Number: 2:2012cv01594
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Serve Additional Party with Summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/9/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 3, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Angela M. Meredith is awarded attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $3,500.00. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 17, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court file the Complaint and serve summons to General Counsel, Social Security Administration, Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice, and United States Attorney for the District of Nevada. Mr. Kalagian will have until September 28, 2012, to comply with Local Rule IA 10-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meredith v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M Meredith
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]