Cruz et al v. Wabash National Corporation

Plaintiff: Geovany Martinez, Jesse Cruz and Maria Cruz
Defendant: Wabash National Corporation
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01627
Filed: September 14, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 26, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 17 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery and Related Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 18, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. First and Second Causes of Action are DISMISSED without prejudice. Third Cause of Action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 27, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 29 Emergency Motion for Relief from Judgment and for leave to amend complaint. The 27 Clerks Judgment is vacated. 28 Bill of Costs is stricken. Amended Complaint due within 10 days. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 2, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 20 days of the filing of this order the identified motions and related briefs of the parties shall be re-filed in the base file. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cruz et al v. Wabash National Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geovany Martinez
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Represented By: Patrick McKnight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Cruz
Represented By: Patrick McKnight
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cruz
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Represented By: Patrick McKnight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wabash National Corporation
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]