Toromanova v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, Tiffany K Labo and National Default Servicing Corporation
Plaintiff: Dimitritza Toromanova
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01637
Filed: September 18, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Extend Time to File Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion Hearing set for December 3, 2012 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before the undersigned is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set for 2/28/13 at 9:00 am in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 7, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 01/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 7, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 , 10 , and 14 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Defendants Motion to expunge Lis Pendens is GRANTED. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. sh all have 10 days to prepare an appropriate order expunging lis pendens. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Defendants Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant is GRANTED. Plaintiff Dimitritza Toromanova is declared a VEXATIOUS LITIGANT and is PE RMANENTLY ENJOINED from filing any further actions against defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. relating to the subject property or recording any documents against the subject property without first obtaining leave of Court. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 01/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 10, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Expunging Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 7, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 06/07/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 30, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 52 Plaintiff's Objection to the Court's orders. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 26, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Expunging Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 25, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 70 Motion to expunge lis pendens and for an order to show cause. Show Cause Response due within 20 days. Submission of Proposed Order due within 10 days. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 26, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Expunging Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Toromanova v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David J. Merrill
Represented By: Morgan F. Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany K Labo
Represented By: Michael E Stoberski
Represented By: Christopher J Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Gregory L Wilde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimitritza Toromanova
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]