Dearman v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Michael W. Dearman
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01642
Filed: September 19, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Serve Additional Party with Summons and Complaint. Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX served 5 Summons and 4 Complaint by certified mail tracking #7012 1010 0001 2174 9633. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 8, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Party with Summons and Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Clerk of Court shall deliver the original summons and complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service on the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 01/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Docs 4 and 5 to USMS for service - AC)
October 31, 2013 31 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees is awarded in favor of Plaintiff Michael W. Dearman and against Defendant Michael J. Astrue in the amount of $4,250.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412 and costs in the amount of $60.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 1920, subject to terms of the Stipulation. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dearman v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Dearman
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]