Kawaye v. Water Tec International, Inc. et al

702) 363-5101 (fax: Water Tec International, Inc.
Defendant: Water Tec of Tucson, Inc. and Westar Kitchen & Bath, LLC
Plaintiff: Hiroko Kawaye
702) 477-0088 (fax: Kemflo North America, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01670
Filed: September 21, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 30, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 4:00 p.m., August 12, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 17, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's representative, Michelle Mannanbach, and Defendant's insurance carrier, First Mercury Insurance Company, shall be allowed to appear telephonically, and shall be available for the duration of the settlement conference scheduled for September 29, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kawaye v. Water Tec International, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 363-5101 (fax: Water Tec International, Inc.
Represented By: Mark B Schellerup
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water Tec of Tucson, Inc.
Represented By: Brady, Vorwereck, Ryder & Caspino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westar Kitchen & Bath, LLC
Represented By: Susan M Sherrod
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiroko Kawaye
Represented By: Terry L. Wike
Represented By: William R. Killip, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 477-0088 (fax: Kemflo North America, LLC
Represented By: Krystal A Kemp
Represented By: James P Silvestri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]