Webb v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Webb
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01850
Filed: October 25, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Re-Serve. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada by delivering a copy of a summons and Complaint (Dkt. #1) to the U.S. Marshal for service or file proof of service if service has been effected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 17, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Magistrate Judge Leen's 23 Report and Recommendation is Accepted. Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration is Denied and Defendant's 21 Cross-Motion to Affirm is Granted. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 4, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Clerk of the Court shall serve the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada by delivering a copy of the 4 Summons and 3 Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. The Clerk of Court shall also re-serve the United States Attorney General. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Webb v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Webb
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]