Yates v. Naphcare, Inc. et al

Defendant: Clark County Detention Center, Douglas Gillespie and Naphcare, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gabriel Yates
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01865
Filed: October 31, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 19 Defendant NaphCare's Motion to Strike is GRANTED in part. The Clerk shall strike from the record 18 Plaintiff's Notice of Possible Stipulated Agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant NaphCares motion to dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Defendant Clark County Dete ntion Center's and Gillespie's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Clark County Detention Center is DISMISSED from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED, with leave to amend within 30 days. Clerk shall send plaintiff a civil rights complaint form with instructions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: plaintiff - EDS)
February 7, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 30 Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 29 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that defendants shall have 21 days from the date on which this order is entered to file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 28, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 32 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 14, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 38 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 16, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 45 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Yates v. Naphcare, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Represented By: Seetal Tejura
Represented By: Joshua L Benson
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Gillespie
Represented By: Seetal Tejura
Represented By: Joshua L Benson
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare, Inc.
Represented By: Seetal Tejura
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]