Stewart v. Warner Brothers Entertainment, Inc. et al.,

Defendant: Larry (Lana) Wachowski, Warner Brothers Entertainment, Inc. and Andy Wachowski
Plaintiff: Sophia Stewart
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01875
Filed: November 1, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER Affirming 12 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs copyright infringement claim is hereby DISMISSED. Denying 11 Motion for Injunctive Relief.; Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 11, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Dismiss to Withdraw and Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint and Petition for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 15, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiffs trademark infringementand unfair practices claims set forth in her Complaint 5 are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The Court also AFFIRMS the Magistrate Judge's Order that Plaintiffs copyright infringement claim be dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have to and including 2/19/2013 within which to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stewart v. Warner Brothers Entertainment, Inc. et al.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry (Lana) Wachowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Brothers Entertainment, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Wachowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]