Williams v. Kim et al

Defendant: Mr. Wolfbrandt, I. Baca, James Cox, Angelique Gray and Sgt. Kim
Plaintiff: Albert Leon Williams
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01900
Filed: November 7, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER Granting 10 Defendants' Motion to Remove Former Counsel Robert J. Simon from CM/ECF Notifications in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 12, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER that count 1, count 3, Defendant Mr. Wolfbrandt and Defendant Angelique Gray are DISMISSED from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall send to plaintiff a civil rights complaint form with instructions. Plaintiff will have 30 days from the date that this order is entered to submit his amended complaint. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Complaint form mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
July 16, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER RE: Informal Settlement Discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 5, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER that Defendants Baca and Cox are DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 2, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER that the clerk shall electronically serve a copy of this order and the court's original 12 , 13 screening orders on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Within 21 days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice re acceptance of service. Plaintiff's 16 Motion for a Status Check is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams v. Kim et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Wolfbrandt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Baca
Represented By: Robert Simon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Represented By: Robert Simon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelique Gray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Kim
Represented By: Robert Simon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Leon Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]