Richmond American Homes of Nevada, Inc. v. Stanton et al

Defendant: Zayda Bustos, Richard Stanton, Anthony Turner and Devron Turner
Plaintiff: Richmond American Homes of Nevada, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01908
Filed: November 7, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER Granting 10 Emergency Motion to Stay NRS Chapter 40 Process Pending outcome of Declaratory Relief. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 4, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 14, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER that 18 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Richmond American's request for declaratory relief is GRANTED. The Court finds that Defendants' NRS Chapter 40 Notice (and supplement) are statuto rily defective as to the "similarly situated owners." The Court finds that the Notice is sufficient to the named Defendants and the parties shall proceed with the NRS Chapter 40 process with respect to the named Defendants. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER Denying 31 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 29 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Richmond American Homes of Nevada, Inc. v. Stanton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zayda Bustos
Represented By: Terry W. Riedy
Represented By: Scott K. Canepa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stanton
Represented By: Terry W. Riedy
Represented By: Scott K. Canepa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Turner
Represented By: Scott K. Canepa
Represented By: Terry W. Riedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devron Turner
Represented By: Terry W. Riedy
Represented By: Scott K. Canepa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richmond American Homes of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen N. Rosen
Represented By: Janice M Michaels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]