United States of America v. Reeves et al

Defendant: Wayne Reeves, James Stoll and Diane Vaoga
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2012cv01916
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that granting 51 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Approve Consent Injunction against Defendant James Stoll is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 45 Minute Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Agreed O rder of Permanent Injunction against James Stoll is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Plaintiff United States of America's Motion to Approve Agreed Order of Permanent Injunction against James Stoll is GRANTED with modifications. FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff will make certain modifications to its "Agreed Order of Permanent Injunction" against James Stoll (ECF No. 28) and resubmit this modified permanent injunction order within 10 days of the filing of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that 47 Plaintiff United States of America's Motion for Further Explanation is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 21, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 40 MOTION to Set Aside Order is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 90 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in full. FURTHER ORDERED that 78 MOTION for Sanctions and for Entry of Default Judgments Against Defendants Wayne Reeves and Diane Vaoga and in favor of the Plaintiff is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 61 Defendant Wayne Reeves's Answer is STRICKEN. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter the defaults of Defendants Wayne Reeves and Diane Vaoga and shall enter default j udgments against Defendants Reeves and Vaoga and in favor of Plaintiff United States of America. The Court shall issue a separate Order outlining the details of the permanent injunction against these Defendants. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff United States of America against Defendants Diane Vaoga and Wayne Reeves. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 1/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION. ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date this Order is entered, Defendants Wayne Reeves and Diane Vaoga shall produce to the United States a list identifying (with names, mailing and email addresses, phone nu mbers, and social security and any other tax-identification numbers) all clients and persons who have purchased their tax plans, arrangements, or programs, and shall file with the Court a certification that they have done so. FURTHER ORDERED that wit hin thirty (30) days from the date this Order is entered, Defendants Wayne Reeves and Diane Vaoga shall contact by mail (or, if a mailing address is unknown, by email) all clients and persons who have previously purchased their tax shelters, plans, a rrangements, or programs, including the trust program, or any other tax shelter, plan or program in which Reeves and/or Vaoga have been involved either individually or through any business entity, and inform those individuals of the Courts findings concerning the falsity of prior representations made by Reeves and/or Vaoga, attaching a copy of this Order of Permanent Injunction, and shall file with the Court a certification that they have done so. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 15 and 21 Defendants' Verified Motions by Unsworn Declaration to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint for Plaintiffs Lack of Standing and this Courts Lack of Jurisdiction of the Subject Matter and Denying 20 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 03/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 16, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing as to Defendants Wayne Reeves and Diane Vaoga. Defendants must comply by 5/16/13 with the procedures in this order to activate their CM/ECF accounts. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 29, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 39 United States Motion to Reconsider. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Court's Order is withdrawn as to Defendant Diane Vaoga. Defendant Vaoga may submit her own motion for permission to file electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 19, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 42 Motion to Set Aside 38 Minute Order and 41 Order for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 11, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Agreed Order of Permanent Injunction Against James Stoll. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 3, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 48 United States of America's Motion to Compel. Defendant Reeves shall respond to the Governments Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents on or before October 21, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 58 Defendants Reeves and Vaoga's Motion to Cancel Status Conference is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 11, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Motion and Special Show Cause to Permit Appearance of Government Counsel Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Mark C. Milton. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 26, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Vaoga shall respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 7, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 67 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 31, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 80 Motion to Vacate Minute Order (#79) and Reset Hearing is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/31/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 4, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Wayne Reeves answer due 1/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Reeves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Vaoga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mark C Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]