Brown v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al

Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc. and Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Harry Ray Brown
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01947
Filed: November 10, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 22 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to file a revised Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, including a statement of the reasons why longer or different time periods should apply to the case, no later than 1/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 01/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 21, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 28 Stipulated Protective Order as modified (section 5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 21, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in the order, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 17, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 35 Stipulation of Discontinuance with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 09/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Ray Brown
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]