Bailey et al v. Suey et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Yates, Anthony Bailey, Norman Belcher and John Scott
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center, Clark County, Nevada, Lt. Flippo, Lt. Kelly, Lt. Kelso and Cpt. Rich Suey
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01954
Filed: November 13, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2014 111 Featured Case ORDER Denying Defendants' 80 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff Anthony Bailey's In Forma Pauperis Status and Declare him a Vexatious Litigant. Plaintiff's 107 Motion for Statements is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 7, 2012 14 Featured Case ORDER that Defendants Lt. Kelly, Clark County Detention Center and Clark County, Nevada are Dismissed. Denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel.This Action shall proceed in accordance with the court's 3 Minute Order and 9 Answer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/7/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 17, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER Denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion of Possible Imminent Danger/Retaliation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 31, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER Denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 14, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER Denying 18 Motion to Restore Defendants Clark County, Clark County Detention Center, LVMPD. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 18, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER Denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 06/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 18, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Strike 37 Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 18, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER Denying 43 Motion for Joinder by Non-Party Harold Marin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 19, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER Granting 41 Motion to Strike 39 Emergency Notice. Non-Party Andre J. King Hardimans improper filing 42 shall be stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 31, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER Denying 47 Motion for Joinder by Lee Reed. Denying 48 Motion for Joinder by Larry McGee. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 7, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER Denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 7, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER Denying 50 Motion for Joinder by non-Party Jerome A. Sears. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 4, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 59 Motion for Joinder. Denying as moot 60 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/4/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 17, 2013 65 Featured Case ORDER that 56 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 8, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER Granting 33 Defendants' Motion to Enforce Payment Fees on Plaintiffs John Scott, Norman Belcher and Gabriel Yates. Show Cause Brief due by 1/21/2014. Responses, if any, due by 1/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 01/08/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 13, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 32 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff Bailey In Forma Pauperis Status and Declare a Vexatious Litigant. Motions due by 2/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 6, 2014 86 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Copies and Denying Plaintiff's 85 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 14, 2014 99 Featured Case ORDER Denying 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order and Denying 97 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint an E.P.A. Monitor. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 04/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bailey et al v. Suey et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Belcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County, Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Flippo
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Kelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Kelso
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. Rich Suey
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]