Bold v. Bank of America Home Loans LLC et al

Plaintiff: David Bold
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans LLC, PRLAP, Inc. and Recontrust Company NA
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01978
Filed: November 14, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Set Aside Default due to Improper Service of Process. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 19, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER that 15 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is given leave to file an Amended Complaint curing the deficiencies identified in this Order by Friday, October 11, 2013. Failure to do so by this deadline will result in DISMISSAL of the action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 5, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk shall close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bold v. Bank of America Home Loans LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans LLC
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRLAP, Inc.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]