Aboulafia v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al

Plaintiff: Steven Aboulafia
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, Bank of New York Mellon, Countrywide Bank, FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc,, Nevada Legal News, Inc. and Recontrust Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv02001
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the Defendants shall file and serve a signed statement under the case and caption. See Order for Details. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/27/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/12/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 8, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Motion for Attorneys' Fees is GRANTED. Defendants shal l submit briefing as to the appropriate amount that should be awarded, pursuant to Rule 54(d)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule II.54-16(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 29, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 30 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Defendants shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $15,560.50, and costs in the amount of $480.96. FURTHER ORDERED that 32 Motion to Alter, Amend Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in the amount of $15,560.50, and costs in the amount of $480.96, in favor of Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, Bank of New York Mellon, Countrywide Bank, FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc,, ReconTrust Company against Plaintiff Steven Aboulafia. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 1/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 37 replaced on 1/29/2014) (MMM).
March 4, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Modify Judgment for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 4, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Defendants shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $8,980.96. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 3/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 9, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 41 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 30, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 1 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aboulafia v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Aboulafia
Represented By: James S Kent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank, FSB
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc,
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Legal News, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]