Vitale v. Social Security Administration

Defendant: Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Salvator H Vitale, IV
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02010
Filed: November 20, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 13 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Motion for Remand and/or Reversal (First Request) filed by Salvator H Vitale, IV, Salvator H Vitale. Plaintiff granted a 45 day extension of time to file the MOTION FOR REMAND AND/OR REVERSAL up to and including May 27, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 17, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 19 Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration is Granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that commissioners cross-motion to affirm the SSAs decision 20 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 9, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 24, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer due 2/8/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vitale v. Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Carlos A Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvator H Vitale, IV
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]