McGee v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al

Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, CitiMortgage, Inc., Corey Geib Team, Federal National Mortgage Association and Nationstar Morgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Francine A McGee
Case Number: 2:2012cv02025
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendant 11 Nationstar's Motion to Dismiss is Granted. Nationstar is dismissed from the action without prejudice. Defendant Cal-Western's 31 and 32 Joinder to the Motions to Dismiss are Granted. Cal-Western is dismissed from the action without prejudice. Defendant 12 CitiMortgage's Motion to Dismiss is Granted in part and Denied in part. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 11, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 62 Federal National Mortgage Association's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 1, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment with regard to declaratory relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is DENIED with regard to fraud and punitive damages. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A Turtzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Geib Team
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Christopher A Turtzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Morgage, LLC
Represented By: Allison Schmidt
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine A McGee
Represented By: Tisha R. Black-Chernine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]