Randazza et al v. Cox et al

Counter Defendant: University of Montana, Tim Vawter, Eliot Bernstein, Sean Boushie, David W. Brown, Martin Cain, David Carr, Bernie Cassidy, Douglas D. Chey, Crystal L Cox, Doug Chey, Tracy L. Coenen, Corbin Fisher, Manwin, Steve Dowling, Allen Fagin, Royce Egnstrom, Dylan Energy, Scott H. Greenfield, Roxanne Grinage, Taylor Kai Groenke, Carlos Miller, Michael Morgan, Leo M. Mulvihill, Jr., Francis Gurry, Kashmir Hill, HireLyrics, John C. Malone, Gregg Mashberg, Janine Robben Oregon State Bar Bulletin, Jason Jones, Joseph Lecesse, Liberty Media Holdings LLC, Obsidian Finance Group, Mulvihill & Rushie, LLC, NPR, PhotographyisNotaCrime.com, Proskauer Rose Law Firm, Protection Group Video, Jennifer Randazza, NewYorkPersonalInjuryAttorneyBlog.com, Randazza Legal Group, Marc J Randazza, John Calkins Sony, Simple Justice, Bruce Sewell, Tomkon Torp Law Firm, blog.bennettandbennett.com, blog.simplejustice.us, Erik Wilbers, Steven Wilker, WIPO, Kenneth P. White, White, White and Newhouse, Bennett and Bennett, Bob Garfield, GoDaddy, Inc., Jessica Griffin Godaddy, Greenberg Traurig Law Firm, Ronald Green, Peter L. Michaelson, New York Times, New York Public Radio, New York, Gloria M. Navarro, Kevin D. Padrick, Jenifer DeWolf Paine, Bob Parsons, Philly Law Blog, Natalia Randazza, Kenneth Rubenstein, Jordan Rushie, SaltyDroid, Eric Turkewitz, Turkewitz Law Firm, Mark Bennett, David S. Aman and Apple
Defendant: Eliot Bernstein and Crystal L Cox
Cross Defendant: Bernie Cassidy and Jessica Griffin Godaddy
Counter Claimant: Crystal L Cox
Plaintiff: Jennifer Randazza, Natalia Randazza and Marc J Randazza
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02040
Filed: November 28, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Cox's 102 Motion to Appoint Counsel is STRICKEN. Cox's 103 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is STRICKEN. Cox's 104 Motion Requesting Reason for Recusal is STRICKEN. Cox's 105 Motion to Legally Relate is STRICKEN. Cox's 106 Motion to Legally Relate is STRICKEN. Cox's 107 Notice of Related Cases is STRICKEN. Cox's 108 Motion to Enjoin Attorney General is STRICKEN. Unless and until Cox receives permission to electronically file documents in 2:13-cv-00297-JCM-VCF, Cox must manually file documents in that case. She may not electronically file documents related to that case in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 12, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Motion for CM/ECF Access. Ms. Cox must provide certification that she has completed the CM/ECF Tutorial on or before 1/11/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 13, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 21 Motion for Preservation of Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2013 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 53 Motion Regarding Insurance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Main Document 135 replaced on 6/13/2013) (MAJ).
June 13, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 60 Motion for Investigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2013 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 77 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Main Document 137 replaced on 6/13/2013) (MAJ).
June 13, 2013 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 78 Motion for Admissions pursuant to LR 26-8. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2013 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 113 Motion to Enjoin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 121 Motion for Clarification on Defendant's Media Status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 115 Motion for Insurance Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Main Document 143 replaced on 6/13/2013) (MAJ).
June 13, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 69 Plaintiffs' Motion to Revoke Crystal Cox's CM/ECF Filing Privileges. The Clerk of Court is directed to immediately revoke Cox's CM/ECF account and password. Cox's continued failure to comply with the Federa l Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of Civil Practice in filing documents with the court may result in the imposition of sanctions up to and including case-dispositive sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 12, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot 26 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Exhibits in Complaint Answer and Counter Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 42 Defendant's Motion to Allow Exhibits Attached to Complaint Answer is Denied as Moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 22, 2013 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 145 Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 8, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 129 Plaintiffs' Motion to Declare Defendant Crystal Cox as a Vexatious Litigant. The Clerk of Court shall strike Cox's 130 Response and Plaintiffs' 131 and 147 Supplements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 14, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 116 Defendant Crystal Cox's Motion for Reconsideration. Defendant shall be permitted to file a proper counterclaim against Plaintiff Marc Randazza. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. Defendant Cox must file any proper counterclaim no later than 2/28/14. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Crystal Cox via USPS and electronic mail - EDS)
February 27, 2014 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 163 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 3, 2014 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 165 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 164 Counterclaim. Plaintiffs' request for a case management conference is GRANTED. A case management conference is scheduled for 4/1/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 5, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 65 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 7, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 157 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 20, 2014 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 122 Defendant's Motion for Clarification in its entirety. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 10, 2014 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying as moot 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 184 Motion for Sanctions; Denying 195 Motion to Relate Case; and Denying 197 Motion to Countersue Jennifer Randazza and x. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 15, 2014 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 101 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 99 Amended Answer to Complaint. The Court STRIKES portions of Defendant Cox's amended Answer 99 pursuant to FRCP 12(f) as reflected in Exhibit A. The m otion is DENIED in all other respects. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the document attached as Exhibit A to hereinafter serve as the superseding amended Answer (and the operative answer) in this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 15, 2014 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 202 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 17, 2014 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 201 Cox's Motion for Investigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 21, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 179 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 164 Counterclaim and Denying 180 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims against the Randazza Legal Group are DISMISSED. Defendant has 14 days to file a motion for leave to amend her counterclaim. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 05/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 2, 2014 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 227 Cox's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 4, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 1/4/2013. denying 22 Motion to Request This Court Investigate Plaintiff Marc Randazza. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 11, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 16 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 11, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. (See Order for details). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall receive a $600 refund from the Court for the six domain names that were transferred pursuant to the WIPO arbitrat ion decision. The Court shall keep the nominal bond of one hundred dollars ($100) for each of the other twenty-six domain names at issue because the evidence indicates that Defendant will suffer only minimal, if any, damage by the issuance of th is preliminary injunction. FURTHER ORDERED that 19 MOTION for Judges and Clerks to Sign a Conflict of Interest Disclosure is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 20 MOTION for Judge Gloria Navarro to Recuse Herself is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 31 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant Crystal Coxs Fugitive Surreply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
February 21, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 44 Defendant's Motion for Recusal of District Judge Gloria Navarro and Denying 81 Motion to Disqualify Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 22, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 48 Plaintiff' Motion to Strike Defendant Crystal Cox's Answer. Defendant must file her Amended Answer no later than 3/11/13, to prevent a default judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 48 Plaintiffs' original Motion to Strike or Dismiss the Initial Counter Complaint is MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 63 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Crystal Cox's Amended Counter Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant's Counter Complaint is STRICKEN. Defendant may only file her Counter Complaint as a separate lawsuit. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - mailed order to Defendant Crystal Cox - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Randazza et al v. Cox et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: University of Montana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Tim Vawter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Eliot Bernstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sean Boushie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: David W. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Martin Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: David Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bernie Cassidy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Douglas D. Chey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Crystal L Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Doug Chey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Tracy L. Coenen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Corbin Fisher, Manwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Steve Dowling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Allen Fagin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Royce Egnstrom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dylan Energy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Scott H. Greenfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roxanne Grinage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Taylor Kai Groenke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Carlos Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Michael Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Leo M. Mulvihill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Francis Gurry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kashmir Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: HireLyrics
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John C. Malone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gregg Mashberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Janine Robben Oregon State Bar Bulletin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jason Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Joseph Lecesse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Liberty Media Holdings LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Obsidian Finance Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Mulvihill & Rushie, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: NPR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: PhotographyisNotaCrime.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Proskauer Rose Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Protection Group Video
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jennifer Randazza
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: NewYorkPersonalInjuryAttorneyBlog.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Randazza Legal Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Marc J Randazza
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Calkins Sony
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Simple Justice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bruce Sewell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Tomkon Torp Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: blog.bennettandbennett.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: blog.simplejustice.us
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Erik Wilbers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Steven Wilker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: WIPO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kenneth P. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: White, White and Newhouse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bennett and Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bob Garfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: GoDaddy, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jessica Griffin Godaddy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Greenberg Traurig Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ronald Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Peter L. Michaelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: New York Times
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: New York Public Radio, New York
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gloria M. Navarro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kevin D. Padrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jenifer DeWolf Paine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bob Parsons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Philly Law Blog
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Natalia Randazza
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kenneth Rubenstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jordan Rushie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SaltyDroid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Eric Turkewitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Turkewitz Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Mark Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: David S. Aman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Apple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliot Bernstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal L Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Bernie Cassidy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Jessica Griffin Godaddy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Crystal L Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Randazza
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Randazza
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc J Randazza
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]