United States of America v. $142,256.00 in United States Currency and/or Casino Chips

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $142,256.00 in United States Currency and/or Casino Chips
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02042
Filed: November 29, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in it's entirety 18 Report and Recommendation. Granting 13 and 14 Motions to Strike. Claimant Look Kim Lok's 10 and 19 Answers are hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 28, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 4:00 p.m., April 8, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 9, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Unopposed Motion to Continue Date to File Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 06/09/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 24, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 40 Unopposed Motion to File the Joint Pre-Trial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 1, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 46 Motion for Default Judgment of Forfeiture. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/01/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $142,256.00 in United States Currency and/or Casino Chips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $142,256.00 in United States Currency and/or Casino Chips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]