Etienne et al v. Ford Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: Guadalupe Bellini-Etienne and Ernst Etienne
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02070
Filed: December 4, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER Denying 7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 31, 2014 31 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on 25 Stipulation Request to Extend Discovery filed by Ernst Etienne and Guadalupe Bellini-Etienne for 2/14/2014 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Ernst Etienne and Guadalupe Bellini must attend the hearing in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 27, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Purported Stipulation to Re-Open Discovery 35 is due on or before March 10, 2014 and the reply in support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Purported Stipulation to Re-Open Discovery is due on or before March 13, 2014. FURTHER ORDERED that a Hearing on 35 Motion to Strike is scheduled for 3/20/2014 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Etienne et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Bellini-Etienne
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Represented By: Eric L. Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernst Etienne
Represented By: Eric L. Marshall
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Vaughn Crawford
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Jon T Pearson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]