Bailey v. Desert Auto Trader, LLC

Plaintiff: Rasheda S. Bailey
Defendant: Desert Auto Trader, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02096
Filed: December 10, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 22 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Ryan Alexander file a certification with the Court no later than March 25, 2014, indicating that he has read and comprehends Local Rules 26-4 and 26-1. Moreover, the Court hereby ORDERS Mr. Alexander to promptly confer with Plaintiff, and ORDERS the parties to submit a stipulated proposed discovery plan no later than March 25, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/18/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 20, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting and Approving 15 Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 03/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 29, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 26 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bailey v. Desert Auto Trader, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheda S. Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Auto Trader, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]