Gaines et al v. Flagstar Bank, FSB

Plaintiff: Freddie Gaines and Billie Gaines
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Case Number: 2:2012cv02154
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 1 - Exhibit A Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 6, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than February 15, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 9, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for Defendant shall file a Statement in Removal which fullycomplies with the 3 Minutes of the Court no later than January 22, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines et al v. Flagstar Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Gaines
Represented By: Arnold Weinstock
Represented By: Dan M. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Gaines
Represented By: Arnold Weinstock
Represented By: Dan M. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: James A. Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.