Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association et al v. Parball Corporation

Plaintiff: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association - International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Pension Trust, Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association - International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Apprentice and Journey and Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association - International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Wage Disability Trust
Defendant: Parball Corporation
Case Number: 2:2013cv00047
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging 12 Order to Show Cause. Counsel shall ensure that notices of related cases are filed expeditiously in all five previously-identified cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 28, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Cause of Action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 12, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part 8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 1 Complaint. Parball Corporation answer due 3/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association et al v. Parball Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association - International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Pension Trust
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Shannon Gallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association - International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Apprentice and Journey
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Shannon Gallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association - International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Wage Disability Trust
Represented By: Shannon Gallo
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parball Corporation
Represented By: Dustin L. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]