Hamrick et al v. Feldman et al

Defendant: Jonathan Feldman, Carter Henson, Jr., Schain, Leifer Guralnick, Robert Holt, Elizabeth Holt, Montcalm, LLC, Patriot Exploration Company, LLC and Matthew Barnes
Plaintiff: Molly Hamrick, Beverly Housemyers and R&M Hamrick Family Trust
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00078
Filed: January 15, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 102 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying without prejudice in part 94 Motion to Substitute Counsel. Wade Gochnour is substituted in the place and stead of R. Kyle Hawes, Jeff C. Wigginton, Brian McManus, Kelsey McPherson as counsel for Defendants Patrio t Exploration, LLC; and Jonathan Feldman. The Motion to Substitute is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with respect to Defendants Montcalm and Barnes because the Motion does not comply with LR 10-6(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 5, 2013 117 Featured Case ORDER that 9 Joint Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 25 Motion to Supplement 9 Motion is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that 63 and 64 Motions to Compel are denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 66 Mot ion for Reconsideration re 65 Order is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that 103 Motion to Set Status Conference is denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the stay of discovery that is in effect in this action shall be lifted once an order is ente red on the Motions to Remand 24 and 26 . Within thirty (30) days of an order on those motions, the parties shall submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order in accordance with LR 26-1 for the Courts review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 25, 2014 132 Featured Case ORDER Granting 120 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hamrick et al v. Feldman et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Feldman
Represented By: Jeff C Wigginton, Jr
Represented By: Brian C. McManus
Represented By: Randall Kyle Hawes
Represented By: Keith Fleischman
Represented By: Amanda N Chaudhuri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Henson, Jr.
Represented By: Stacy Lee Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schain, Leifer Guralnick
Represented By: Nathan Montgomery Rymer
Represented By: Brett K South
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Holt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Holt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montcalm, LLC
Represented By: Jeff C Wigginton, Jr
Represented By: Brian C. McManus
Represented By: Randall Kyle Hawes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Exploration Company, LLC
Represented By: Kelsey A. McPherson
Represented By: Brian C. McManus
Represented By: Randall Kyle Hawes
Represented By: Keith Fleischman
Represented By: Amanda N Chaudhuri
Represented By: Jeff C Wigginton, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Barnes
Represented By: Jeff C Wigginton, Jr
Represented By: Brian C. McManus
Represented By: Randall Kyle Hawes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Hamrick
Represented By: Anthony Vitullo
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Represented By: Laura Richards Sherry
Represented By: Austin H. England
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Housemyers
Represented By: Anthony Vitullo
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Represented By: Laura Richards Sherry
Represented By: Austin H. England
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&M Hamrick Family Trust
Represented By: Austin H. England
Represented By: Laura Richards Sherry
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Represented By: Anthony Vitullo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]