Green v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Michael M. Green
Case Number: 2:2013cv00083
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Concerning Review of Social Security Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 18, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 20 Report and Recommendation; Granting in part 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Reversal or Remand; and Denying 18 Defendant's Cross-Motion to Affirm. This case is REMANDED for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 06/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 15, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting Attorney Fees in the amount of $3000.00 in favor of Plaintiff, Michael M. Green and against Defendant, Carolyn W. Colvin, Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
January 25, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. The Clerk shall file the complaint and serve the Commissioner of Social Security and US Attorney via certified mail. The clerk shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael M. Green
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]