Austin v. State of Nevada et al

Defendant: District Court Nevada and State of Nevada
Plaintiff: Keith Austin
Case Number: 2:2013cv00089
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff must file his Amended Complaint no later than September 15, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 13 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 9, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 14, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff must file his Amended Complaint by 7/15/2013. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. State of Nevada et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Court Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Austin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]