Putzer v. Attal., et al.,

Defendant: Shmuel Attal, Susan Brager, Larry Brown, Randal Brown, Camp, Tom Collins, Curry, John Donahue, Gary L Driscoll, Farside, B. Fucile, Getler, Doug Gillespie, Chris Giunchigliani, Bonnie Polley, A. Reynosa, Brian Sandoval, Mary Beth Scow, Elton Smith, J. Taitano, L. Taylor, H. Thomas and Lawrence Weekly
Plaintiff: David Saul Putzer
Case Number: 2:2013cv00165
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall have 21 days within which to file an executed CJA 23 financial affidavit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 4 Plaintiff's Motion to raise his prison copy credit limit is DENIED as Moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 08/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: CJA 23 form, blank complaint, IFP, copy of complaint and instructions to Plaintiff - AC)
September 30, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 and 11 Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis subject to Plaintiff's obligation to pay the full filing fee of $350.00 upon funds being available. Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to File a Longer than Normal Complaint is Granted and the Clerk shall file the [1-1] original Complaint. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint and Motion to File a Longer than Normal Amended Complaint remain under submission at this time, pending screening. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 3, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk to Mail Plaintiff Free of Charge a File Stamped Copy of Every Document Submitted to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 15, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 62 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Plaintiff may appeal this order to the presiding district judge in the instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 10, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 17, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the above-entitled action be, and hereby is, DISMISSED without prejudice only as to defendants Shmuel Attal, Elton Smith, Farside, and John Donahue. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 26, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 70 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 26, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 19 Motion to Dismiss is hereby DENIED as Moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 55 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 67 Plaintiff's Objections are hereby OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 69 Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 20, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of all defendants and against plaintiff David Saul Putzer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Putzer v. Attal., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shmuel Attal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Brager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Fucile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Giunchigliani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Reynosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Scow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Taitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Saul Putzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]