Morgan v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Carolyn A. Morgan
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00173
Filed: February 1, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Concerning Review of Social Security Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 18, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 24 Report and Recommendation; Denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; and Granting 20 Defendant's Cross-Motion to Affirm. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 06/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 6, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint and serve the Commissioner of t he Social Security Administration and the US Attorney General via certified mail. The Clerk shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada, and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. FURTHER O RDERED that Defendants shall have 60 days from the date of service to file their answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morgan v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn A. Morgan
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]