Collazo v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

702) 938-1511 (fax: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
702) 364-1655 (fax: Claudia Collazo
Case Number: 2:2013cv00194
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a status report by June 17, 2013 advising the Court of the status of the settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Status Report Requesting an Extension of Time to Confirm Settlement. Stipulation due within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/1/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 20, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than April 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collazo v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 938-1511 (fax: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Julian Sharp
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 364-1655 (fax: Claudia Collazo
Represented By: Daniel S Simon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]