Salgado v. Williams et al

Defendant: Brian Williams, Sr., Dr. Sanchez, Dr. Romeo Aramas, C. Dressler and R. Bannister
Plaintiff: Octavio Salgado
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00220
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Payment of filing fees due within 30 days. Payment of filing fees due 11/18/2013. The Attorney Generals Office shall file a notice advising the Court and plaintiff of t he names of the defendants it accepts service for and who it does not accept service for. An answer is due within 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Finance; Chief of Inmate Services ;Kat Howe - SLR)
May 28, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER Denying as moot 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Produce Notice of Defendant's Documents; Denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; and Granting 21 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Medical Records Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 9, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER Re: INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Salgado v. Williams et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Romeo Aramas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Dressler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bannister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Salgado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]