Repass v. Clark County Detention Center et al

Defendant: Dr. Wolff, Clark County Detention Center, Sheriff Douglas Gillespie, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Naphcare, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ryan Repass
Case Number: 2:2013cv00237
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. Discovery is stayed until 9/19/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 4, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 29 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties, jointly or individually, shall file a status update as regards the Motions to Dismiss no later than six months after the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 29, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss. All Claims against CCDC are Dismissed with prejudice. Granting in part and Denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss. Granting 24 Motion to Strike 22 Suppleme nt.Granting 28 Motion to Amend Complaint. All claims against Dr. Wolff are Dismissed. Defendants shall file notice of Repass's status within 7 days. Proof of Service due within 14 days. Amended Complaint due within 60 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 5, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 37 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Repass v. Clark County Detention Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Wolff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Represented By: Seetal Tejura
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Douglas Gillespie
Represented By: Seetal Tejura
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Seetal Tejura
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare, Inc.
Represented By: Seetal Tejura
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Repass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]