West v. Nye County Detention et al

Defendant: Karyn Smith, Rouasvill, Risen, Nye County Health and Human Services, Nye County Detention, Shirley Trummell, Nye County Medical Clinic, Anthony Demao and Rick Marshall
Plaintiff: Hyrum Joseph West
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00271
Filed: February 19, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER that the clerk of court shall issue summons to the named defendants, and deliver with copies of 8 amended complaint to the US Marshal for service. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 28, 2014 18 Featured Case ORDER that 14 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall STRIKE 15 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER that 23 Motion to Provide Discovery of Unserved Defendants is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants will file Sargent Risen's last known address UNDER SEAL. FURTHER ORDERED that 25 Motion to Extend the Discovery Cut-Off Date is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 26 Motion for Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 28, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Clerk of Court shall file the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim, with leave to amend within 30 days. Clerk shall send plaintiff a civil rights complaint form with instructions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff title amended complaint as directed in this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: plaintiff - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: West v. Nye County Detention et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyn Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rouasvill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County Health and Human Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County Detention
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Trummell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County Medical Clinic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Demao
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyrum Joseph West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]