Nachman v. Regenocyte Worldwide Inc. et al

Defendant: Dr. Zannos G Grekos, Michael R Calcaterra, Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC, Regenocyte Worldwide Inc., Regenocyte, LLC and Intercellular Sciences, LLC
Plaintiff: Leslie Nachman
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00319
Filed: February 26, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Gabriel L Grasso withdrawn from the case as to Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC and Michael Calcaterra. Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC shall have until 7/19/2013, in which to reta in new counsel. Defendant Michael Calcaterra shall have until 7/19/2013 to either retain counsel or file a notice that he will appeal pro se. Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants at address listed in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: defendants as ordered - EDS)
February 5, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER Denying Defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Denying Defendants' 24 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 14, 2014 62 Featured Case ORDER that a Motion Hearing re 59 and 56 Motions to Compel is set for 3/4/2014 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 02/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 5, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER Granting 56 and 59 Plaintiff's Motions to Compel. Defendant shall have until 3/18/2014 in which to provide full and complete responses to the Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. The Court will assess monetary sanctions for the necessity of the motions to compel in favor of the Plaintiff against these Defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $2,025.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 03/05/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 24, 2014 73 Featured Case ORDER Granting 71 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Gabriel L. Grasso as to Defendant Intercellular Sciences, LLC. Defendant shall have until 4/21/2014 to retain new counsel. Failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation to the Dis trict Judge for sanctions, including case-dispositive sanctions. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to Defendant - SLD)
July 29, 2014 76 Featured Case ORDER Adopting and Accepting in full Magistrate Judge Peggy Leen's 75 Report and Recommendation. The Answers of Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC and Michael Calcaterra shall be stricken and default judgment entered against them. Pl aintiff's 60 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Regenocyte Worldwide, Inc., Regenocyte, LLC, Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC, and Dr. Zannos Grekos is Granted. Default Judgment shall be entered against Defendants Regenocyte Worldwi de, Inc., Regenocyte, LLC, Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC, and Dr. Zannos Grekos. Plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief on the issues of damages as to each Defendant within 30 days of this Order and attach a proposed order to his brief. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 30, 2014 77 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Leslie Nachman and against Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC, Michael Calcaterra, Regenocyte Worldwide, Inc., Regenocyte, LLC, Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC, and Dr. Zannos Grekos. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 1, 2014 78 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER Adopting and Accepting in full 75 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. FURTHER ORDERED that Default Judgment shall be entered against Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC and Michael Calcaterra. FURTHER ORDERED that Default Judgment shall be entered against Defendants Regenocyte Worldwide, Inc., Regenocyte, LLC, Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC, and Dr. Zannos Grekos. Plaintiff is ordered to provide supplemental briefing on the issue of damages as to each Defendant, and to attach a proposed order to his brief. Plaintiff shall file his supplemental brief within thirty (30) days of the Order issued on July 29, 2014 (dkt. no. 76 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nachman v. Regenocyte Worldwide Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Zannos G Grekos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R Calcaterra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regenocyte Worldwide Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regenocyte, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercellular Sciences, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Nachman
Represented By: Jason M Gerber
Represented By: Marquis Aurbach Coffing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]