Banks v. Naphcare

Defendant: Naphcare
Plaintiff: Gregory Banks
Case Number: 2:2013cv00324
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court would grant 6 and 9 MOTIONS for reconsideration if the court of appeals remands for that purpose. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 19, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 and 9 Motions to Reconsider. Vacating 4 Order Dismissing Case and 5 Clerk's Judgment. This Action is reinstated. The Clerk shall file the Complaint. The complaint is dismissed. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Petitioner with forms - SLR)
July 9, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the official-capacity claims against all defendants are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summons to the named defendants and deliver same with copies of the amended complaint 18 to the U.S. Marshal for service. FURTHER ORDERED that 25 and 26 Motions for Status of the Case are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/8/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 28, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 29 Motion to Extend Time re 27 Order. Plaintiff shall have until 8/29/2014 to furnish the U.S. Marshall the required Form USM-285. Pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Plaintiff must accomplish service within 120 days from 7/9/2014, the date the court entered the screening order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - two USM forms mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
December 19, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Production of Documents. The Motion is Granted to the extent that the Clerk of Court shall issue a subpoena duces tecum to the Custodian of Records for Naphcare in blan k to Plaintiff. The Motion is Denied in all other respects. Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel is Denied. Plaintiff's 40 Motion to Extend Time is Granted. Plaintiff has until 1/16/2015 to file a motion requesting the USMS serve any remaining unnamed Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 17, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This action is DISMISSED for Plaintiff's failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. The Clerk of the court shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from the dismissal of this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 05/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Naphcare
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]