Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Linda Ann Smith
Case Number: 2:2013cv00347
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting and Adopting in full 20 Report and Recommendation.Denying 16 Motion to Remand. Granting 17 Cross Motion to Affirm. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 4, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall not be required to pay the filing fee of $350.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiffs Complaint. The Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date that this Order is entered to file an amended complaint correcting the noted deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 20, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff is permitted to maintain this action to conclusion without the necessity of prepayment. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint (#1-1) along with the 4 Supplement. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of t he Social Security Administration and the Attorney General of the United States by certified mail. The Clerk of Court shall serve the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada via U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ann Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]