Nunez v. Harper et al

Defendant: Terry Charles Harper and Pahoa Express, Inc
Plaintiff: Lynneve Nunez
Case Number: 2:2013cv00392
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING as moot 104 Motion to Extend Time and 105 Motion to Name an Additional Expert Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 25, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 04/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 12, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 42 Motion to Strike Defendants Rebuttal Expert, Derek Duke, M.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 20, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 63 Motion for Clarification Regarding 50 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 20, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 59 Motion to Name Additional Expert Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 8, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 78 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 30, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Denying as moot 53 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 18, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall seal 90 MOTION to Strike Documents Produced Late in Discovery. Defendants shall refile their motion by 11/25/2014. Denying without prejudice 91 Motion to exclude documents produced following the close of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 21, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 92 Motion to excuse Terry Charles Harper and Pahoa Express, Inc. from attendance at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. Harper et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Charles Harper
Represented By: Alex De Castroverde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pahoa Express, Inc
Represented By: Kevin S Smith
Represented By: Joseph M. Ortuno
Represented By: Kym S. Cushing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynneve Nunez
Represented By: Richard E Tanasi
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Peter S. Christiansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]