Jarvis v. Nye County et al

Plaintiff: Danny Jarvis
Defendant: Rick Marshall, Nye County and Tony DeMeo
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00394
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 5 Ex Parte Motion to appoint marshal to serve summons and complaint. Denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The clerk of the court shall file the complaint. The complaint is DISMISSED. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 2, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 19, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall have through 7/5/2013 to pay the initial partial filing fee. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jarvis v. Nye County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Jarvis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony DeMeo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]