United States of America v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Granite Petroleum, Inc. and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00400
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 36 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 27, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this Order with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 16, 2014 54 Featured Case ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. GCS is directed to file its Amended Complaint within 10 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 23, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER Granting 55 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Martin I. Melendrez and Robert J. Berens are substituted in place and stead of Attorneys D. Scott DeGraffenried and Kent B. Scott for Third Party Defendant Merchants Bonding Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/2314. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cary B Domina
Represented By: D. Scott DeGraffenried
Represented By: Michael W. Brimley
Represented By: Kent B. Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Petroleum, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]