Morningstar et al v. Jianping et al

Defendant: Zhang Weiguo, Quan Xie, Bruce Richardson, Yi Liu, Zou Dejun, Li Yu, Rino International Corporation, Ben Wang, Qui Jianping and Kennith C. Johnson
Plaintiff: Alice Slettedahl and M. Aileen Morningstar
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00427
Filed: March 13, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 103 Featured Case ORDER RE: TRANSFER TO DISTRICT OF NEVADA by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Defendant's Motion is, for all intents and purposes, GRANTED. Rather than stay this case, however, the court transfers this matter to the District of Nevada. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 3/13/2013.]
April 17, 2013 114 Featured Case ORDER Granting 100 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 3, 2013 134 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 109 Motion to Reassign and Coordinate Recently Transferred Case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
May 22, 2013 143 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 140 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Attorneys Michael N. Feder, John C. Dwyer, Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria, and Adam C Trigg for Zhang Weiguo substituted in place and stead of Attorneys Abran E. Vigil, Michael R. Petrocelli, and Neal A. Potischman. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 05/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 26, 2013 153 Featured Case ORDER that the stay is lifted. Plaintiff shall have 92 days to file service on the parties named in the order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 10, 2013 154 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 144 Plaintiff's Motion for Constructive Trust. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 7, 2014 162 Featured Case ORDER Granting 161 Motion to Voluntary Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morningstar et al v. Jianping et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhang Weiguo
Represented By: Michael R. Petrocelli
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: Amitabh Chibber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quan Xie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Richardson
Represented By: Robert David Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yi Liu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zou Dejun
Represented By: Michael C Tu
Represented By: Lindsay R Pennington
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li Yu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rino International Corporation
Represented By: Patrick D Robbins
Represented By: Emily V Griffen
Represented By: Richard Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Wang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qui Jianping
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Represented By: Diane M Doolittle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennith C. Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan Bach
Represented By: Adam C Trigg
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Emily V Griffen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Slettedahl
Represented By: Curtis B. Coulter
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Germain
Represented By: Robin Winchester
Represented By: Eric L. Zagar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Aileen Morningstar
Represented By: Eric L. Zagar
Represented By: Robin Winchester
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Germain
Represented By: Curtis B. Coulter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]