Guerrero-Madrid v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al

Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and IndyMac Bank, FSB
Plaintiff: Cesar Guerrero-Madrid
Case Number: 2:2013cv00432
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 31 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 09/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 8, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Expunge Lis Pendens. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have 30 days in which to amend his Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 26, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 35 Motion for Summary Judgment and 37 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. It Is Further Ordered that 40 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint is Granted. Amended Complaint Due Within 30 days of This Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 24, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation to Extend Time. Amended Complaint deadline: 5/11/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero-Madrid v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Guerrero-Madrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]