Soete v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Lori Soete
Case Number: 2:2013cv00439
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (First Request) to Respond to 21 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration. Responses due by 4/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 23, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Response to 21 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 4/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 3, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Oral Argument re 21 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration and 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment for 4/9/2015 03:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 5, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's counsel's 33 Motion to Appear Telephonically at the hearing scheduled for 4/9/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 2, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 37 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically as to Defense Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 4, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the Complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by certified mail. The Clerk shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soete v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Soete
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]