Unites States of America v. $168,702.91 in United States Currency

Defendant: $40,000.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: Unites States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv00462
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Stipulated Settlement Agreement for Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture as to Matthew Taylor. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 28, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Motion for Default Judgment of Forfeiture. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the Property. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unites States of America v. $168,702.91 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $40,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unites States of America
Represented By: Cristina D Silva
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]