Calvert v. Ellis et al

Plaintiff: Lauren Calvert
Defendant: Daily Express, Inc., Michael Wayne Ellis and Express Daily
Case Number: 2:2013cv00464
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 98 Motion to Reopen Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Plaintiff Designating Rebuttal Expert to John Schneider, Ph.D. Plaintiff's 108 Motion to Compel Mandatory Settlement Conference is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 15, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sealing 85 Response to Motion. Plaintiff shall refile her opposition 85 with the appropriate redactions of confidential information, not later than December 22, 2014. Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide chambers a paper copy of the redac ted opposition not later than 4:00 p.m. on December 22, 2014. See Special Order No. 109 at IV.D (requiring parties to provide chambers a paper copy of all electronic documents that exceed 50 pages in length). Defendant is ORDERED to provide chambers a paper copy of the motion to exclude not later than 4:00 p.m. on December 17, 2014. See Special Order No. 109. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
December 18, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 130 Request to excuse Darlene Ellis from attendance at settlement conference. A paper Copy of 76 MOTION to Exclude no later than 12:00 p.m. on 12/19/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 16, 2015 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Hearing re 76 Defendants' MOTION to Exclude All Evidence regarding Plaintiff's Future Surgeries is set for 1/23/2015 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference to 2/20/2015 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The settlement conference statements shall be received in the Magistrate Judge's chambers not later than 2/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 12, 2015 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 76 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 20, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 55 and 56 Motions in Limine. Defendants' 80 Motion in Limine to Introduce Evidence of Plaintiff's Expert's Misprison Conviction is Granted. Defendants' 82 Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Experts is Denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 16, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Defendants' 81 MOTION in Limine Excluding Reports/Testimony of Mr. Phillip Sidlow. Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/8/2015 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 17, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 151 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 13, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Magistrate Judge Koppe's 144 Order is Affirmed in its entirety and Plaintiff's 147 Objection is Overruled. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 4, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 26 Stipulation to Substitute Attorney Bruce Scott Dickinson in place and stead of Attorney Kevin R Diamond for defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 6, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Lauren Calvert shall file the Second Amended Complaint by 2/20/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 24, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 72 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply to 54 MOTION to Strike. Defendants must file any surreply by 7/1/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvert v. Ellis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Calvert
Represented By: Ryan M. Anderson
Represented By: Nathan R. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daily Express, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin R Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wayne Ellis
Represented By: Kevin R Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Daily
Represented By: Kevin R Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]