Neal v. Walgreen Co. et al

Defendant: BCI Coca-Cola Bottling Company of Los Angeles and Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Sandra Neal
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00486
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Motion Hearing re: 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is set for 12/18/2013 04:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Responses due by 12/5/2013. No later than 12/5/2013, Plaintiffs current counsel of record shall serve Plaintiff with this order that she appear and shall file a proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 13, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Withdraw Attorneys John B. Greene and Robert D. Vannah as to Plaintiff. The hearing set for December 18, 2013 is Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Plaintiff - SLR)
March 12, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Status Hearing is set for 4/2/2014 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Neal v. Walgreen Co. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCI Coca-Cola Bottling Company of Los Angeles
Represented By: Ashlie L. Surur
Represented By: Steven T. Jaffe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: James F Holtz
Represented By: Scott J. Ingold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Neal
Represented By: Robert D. Vannah
Represented By: John B. Greene
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]