Kirkland v. Rio Hotel and Casino

Defendant: Rio Hotel and Casino
Plaintiff: Daniel Kirkland
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00500
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for f ailure to exhaust administrative remedies. Plaintiff shall have until 6/15/2013 to file an Amended Complaint in the event he receives a right-to-sue letter from EEOC. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 8, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's breach of contract, common law wrongful termination, retaliation, and section 1983 claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a motion to amend complaint within 30 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/8/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 12, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Clerk shall close case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kirkland v. Rio Hotel and Casino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Hotel and Casino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kirkland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]