Hardy v. GlobalOptions Services, Inc. et al

Defendant: Robert Bilvado, Kyle Elworth, GlobalOptions Services, Inc. and Anthony Saros
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Hardy
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00514
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 27 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Notice of Certification is due by 7/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 12, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 14, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant GlobalOptions Services, Inc.'s 9 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Extend Time. Granting 2 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Amended Complaint deadline: 12/6/2013. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 21, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defense counsel Akerman LLP's 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Anthony Saros. Withdrawn counsel shall serve a copy of this order on its former client Anthony Saros and file a notice of service by 5/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 23, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant GlobalOptions Services, Inc.'s 45 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 43 First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and this case shall be closed. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hardy v. GlobalOptions Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bilvado
Represented By: Deborah A. Catalano
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Elworth
Represented By: Deborah A. Catalano
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlobalOptions Services, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah A. Catalano
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Saros
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Deborah A. Catalano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Hardy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]