Platinum Realty and Holdings, LLC v. Lee et al

Plaintiff: Platinum Realty and Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Randall M. Lee and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00535
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Temporary Restraining Order will expire by its own terms in 14 days from the date of its issuance. Plaintiff shall serve 21 Pen ding Motion for Preliminary Injunction on all Defendants and file certification of said service on the docket by 1/17/2014. Defendants shall file a Response, if any, by 1/27/14. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 1/28/2014 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 28, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction in that Wells Fargo is enjoined from initiating foreclosure proceedings on and selling the Property. Proceedings in this action before the Court, including discovery, shall con tinue without hindrance. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Injunctive Order will continue until the Nevada Supreme Court adequately interprets Nev. Rev. Stat. § 116.3116 to allow this Court to determine the interests of the parties in the Prope rty following the foreclosure sale of the 9-month HOA super priority lien under the statute. Plaintiff shall post a bond in an amount equal to $1,000.00, in addition to the $500.00 bond already posted within 14 days of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 17, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER certifying question of law to the Nevada Supreme Court pursuant to Rule 5 of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court under the official seal of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions are DENIED without prejudice, with permission to re-file upon resolution of the Court's Certified Quest ion to the Nevada Supreme Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, beginning June 1, 2014, and every three months thereafter, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report, including a statement from Platinum Realty affirming that all taxes, fees and maintenance fees are current and up to date. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platinum Realty and Holdings, LLC v. Lee et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Platinum Realty and Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Richard L Tobler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall M. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]