Rangel v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. et al

Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. and Lehman Brothers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosa E Rangel
Case Number: 2:2013cv00536
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 15 and 17 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Orders. The parties are ORDERED to hold the Rule 26(f) conference no later than June 14, 2013. The parties are ORDERED to submit a joint proposed discovery plan no later than June 18, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 5, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order in which to amend her complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 3, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rangel v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Karl O Riley
Represented By: Richard Gordon
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa E Rangel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]