Barber v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Larry Barber
Defendant: Sheriff Douglas C Gillespie, Metro Police Department, Kirk Primas and Steve Williams
Case Number: 2:2013cv00538
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 15 Motion to Extend Copywork Limit is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 5, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 11 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that Plaintiff's 1983 claim and state law claim for negligent training and supervision against the LVMPD is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 14, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 35 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Criminal Investigation. Discovery shall be STAYED until the earlier of 9/2/2014 or the criminal proceedings against Defendant Steve Williams are complete. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that the parties shall file joint status reports on 5/13/2014 and on 8/1/2014. The parties shall file a joint proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order within 10 days after the stay expires or no later than 9/12/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 8, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery shall be stayed until the earlier of November 6, 2014 or the criminal proceedings against Defendant Steve Williams are complete. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 10/30/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 10 days after the stay expires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 16, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Motion Extend Prison Copywork Limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 28, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Stay. Discovery shall be stayed until the earlier of either March 16, 2015 or the criminal proceedings against Defendant Steve Williams is complete. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status r eport on March 2, 2015 regarding the status of the criminal proceedings and necessity of the stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 10 days after the stay expires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
March 16, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Continue Stay of Discovery Pending Outcome of Criminal Investigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 65 replaced on 3/17/2015 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
August 7, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 6 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim against all Defendants, Fourteenth Amendment claim against all Defendants, punitive damages claim against Metro, and claims against the individual d efendants named in their official capacity are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice because Plaintiff failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and amendment would be futile. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Douglas C Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Primas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.