Taddeo v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Frank Taddeo
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00541
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/24/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 7, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Defendant's Motion to Stay During Lapse in Appropriations. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a new scheduling order within 7 days after the lapse in appropriations is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Additional Party with 9 Summons and 4 Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX via certified mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 04/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Taddeo v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Taddeo
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]